# NCERT Solutions For Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Exercise 2.3

## Ncert Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Exercise 2.3:

Ncert Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Exercise 2.3 pf: In this Chapter Whole numbers We learn the basics of the Numbers System In class 6 maths ncert Exercise 2.3 Solutions. This Chapter Whole Numbers is very important for Class 6 maths Students to get a High Score in their Exam. And we help the Class 6 Students to Achieve Their Dream By providing Class 6 Maths Ncert Solutions Chapter 2 Whole numbers Exercise 2.3 With Free Pdf Download. And We also Provide Video solutions Of Whole Numbers Class 6 maths Ncert Solutions.

### Ncert Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Exercise 2.3 pdf:-

Exercise 2.3 Class 6 maths NCERT solutions Chapter 2 Whole Numbers:-

### Ncert Solution for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Exercise 2.3 Tips:-

Patterns in Whole Numbers:-
We shall try to arrange numbers in elementary shapes made up of dots. The
shapes we take are (1) a line (2) a rectangle (3) a square and (4) a triangle.
Every number should be arranged in one of these shapes. No other shape is
allowed.
Every number can be arranged as a line;
The number 2 is shown as
The number 3 is shown as
and so on.
Some numbers can be shown also as rectangles.
For example,
The number 6 can be shown as
a rectangle. Note there are 2
rows and 3 columns.
Some numbers like 4 or 9 can also be arranged as squares;
Some numbers can also be arranged as triangles.
For example,
Note that the triangle should have its two sides equal. The number of
dots in the rows starting from the bottom row should be like 4, 3, 2, 1.
The top row should always have 1 dot.
Patterns Observation:-
Observation of patterns can guide you in simplifying processes. Study the
following:
(a) 117 + 9 = 117 + 10 – 1 = 127 – 1 = 126
(b) 117 – 9 = 117 – 10 + 1 = 107 + 1 = 108
(c) 117 + 99 = 117 + 100 – 1 = 217 – 1 = 216
(d) 117 – 99 = 117 – 100 + 1 = 17 + 1 = 18
9, 99, 999,…?
Here is one more pattern :
(a) 84 × 9 = 84 × (10 – 1) (b) 84 × 99 = 84 × (100 – 1)
(c) 84 × 999 = 84 × (1000 – 1)
Do you find a shortcut to multiplying a number by numbers of the form
9, 99, 999,…?
Such shortcuts enable you to do sums verbally.
The following pattern suggests a way of multiplying a number by 5 or 25
or 125. (You can think of extending it further).
(i) 96 × 5 = 96 ×
10
2 =
960
2 = 480 (ii) 96 × 25 = 96 ×
100
4 =
9600
4 = 2400
(iii) 96 × 125 = 96 ×
1000
8 =
96000
8 = 12000…
What does the pattern that follows suggest?
(i) 64 × 5 = 64 ×
10
2 = 32 × 10 = 320 × 1
(ii) 64 × 15 = 64 ×
30
2 = 32 × 30 = 320 × 3
(iii) 64 × 25 = 64 ×
50
2 = 32 × 50 = 320 × 5
(iv) 64 × 35 = 64 ×
70
2 = 32 × 70 = 320 × 7. …..